Senate | 06/30/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.168 | ||
Senate | 06/26/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.146 | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | substituted for a3598 | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | home rule request | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2023 | referred to cities | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.573 | ||
Senate | 01/04/2023 | REFERRED TO CITIES 2 |