Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2023 | referred to consumer affairs and protection | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.326 |