Senate | 05/29/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 434A | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Assembly | 01/25/2023 | referred to real property taxation | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/18/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.136 |