Senate | 09/20/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.476 | ||
Senate | 09/19/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.672 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | substituted for a928 | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | referred to election law | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.458 | ||
Senate | 01/04/2023 | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |