Senate | 12/22/2023 | APPROVAL MEMO.73 | ||
Senate | 12/22/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.751 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.323 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | substituted for a1178 | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 01/25/2023 | referred to insurance | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/18/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.138 |