Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | referred to governmental operations | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 448B | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | AMENDED 448A | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.981 |