Senate | 04/16/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2024 | referred to insurance | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.90 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.139 |