Assembly | 02/06/2024 | referred to codes | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 492B | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.114 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Assembly | 01/18/2023 | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.72 | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 01/11/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 492A | ||
Senate | 01/11/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |