Assembly | 06/06/2024 | referred to transportation | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | HOME RULE REQUEST | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.301 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.251 |