Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A222 | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.104 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.198 |