Senate | 09/20/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.477 | ||
Senate | 09/19/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.568 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | substituted for a268 | ||
Assembly | 01/10/2023 | referred to election law | ||
Senate | 01/10/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/10/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/09/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.7 | ||
Senate | 01/09/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 01/05/2023 | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |