Senate | 05/30/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A4138A | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1342 | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | REFERENCE CHANGED TO HEALTH | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 593A | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO MENTAL HEALTH |