Senate | 06/06/2023 | SUBSTITUTED BY A1707A | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 599A | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | recommitted to health | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | substitution reconsidered | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2023 | ordered to third reading cal.196 | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2023 | substituted for a1707 | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.75 | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2023 | referred to health |