Senate | 06/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | referred to higher education | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.77 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.76 | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |