Senate | 12/13/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.725 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | ordered to third reading cal.175 | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | substituted for a5653b | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | REPASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 608C | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 608B | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2023 | referred to consumer affairs and protection | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.77 | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 01/12/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 608A | ||
Senate | 01/12/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION | ||
Senate | 01/05/2023 | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |