Assembly | 05/13/2024 | referred to election law | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.622 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS | ||
Senate | 01/09/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.8 | ||
Senate | 01/09/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |