Senate | 11/22/2024 | APPROVAL MEMO.17 | ||
Senate | 11/22/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.500 | ||
Senate | 11/15/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.528 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted for a7243 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.4 | ||
Assembly | 01/08/2024 | referred to election law | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS | ||
Senate | 01/09/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.9 |