Assembly | 12/23/2024 | approval memo.100 | ||
Senate | 12/21/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.639 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.229 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | substituted for a1244d | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | referred to codes | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | REPASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 612D | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | referred to election law | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 04/15/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 612C | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | AMENDED 612B | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.623 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | RECOMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 612A | ||
Senate | 01/09/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.11 | ||
Senate | 01/09/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |