Assembly | 05/28/2024 | referred to health | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1101 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1729 | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |