Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.539 | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 775A | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |