Senate | 03/03/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.80 | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.84 | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2023 | substituted for a992 | ||
Assembly | 01/24/2023 | referred to children and families | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/09/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.39 | ||
Senate | 01/06/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |