Senate | 03/03/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.89 | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.103 | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2023 | substituted for a605 | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2023 | referred to election law | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/09/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.61 | ||
Senate | 01/06/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |