Senate | 03/24/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.110 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2023 | ordered to third reading cal.52 | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2023 | substituted for a3751 | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2023 | referred to environmental conservation | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/09/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.66 | ||
Senate | 01/06/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |