Senate | 03/03/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.92 | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/24/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.51 | ||
Assembly | 01/24/2023 | substituted for a1001 | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2023 | referred to education | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/09/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.68 | ||
Senate | 01/06/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |