Assembly | 05/30/2024 | referred to governmental operations | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.865 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |