Senate | 05/17/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 897C | ||
Senate | 05/17/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 897B | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 897A |