Assembly | 05/29/2024 | referred to housing | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1237 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.199 |