Senate | 11/22/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.501 | ||
Senate | 11/15/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.310 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | substituted for a6637 | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | referred to correction | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1035 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |