Senate | 09/15/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.423 | ||
Senate | 09/07/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2023 | ordered to third reading cal.109 | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2023 | substituted for a4072 | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2023 | referred to election law | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.459 | ||
Senate | 01/09/2023 | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |