Senate | 01/30/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2024 | referred to aging | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.78 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.79 | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 01/10/2023 | REFERENCE CHANGED TO HEALTH |