Senate | 06/28/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.152 | ||
Senate | 06/28/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.301 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | substituted for a1619a | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | REPASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 1001A | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2024 | referred to insurance | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/20/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.164 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1325 |