Senate | 12/22/2023 | VETOED MEMO.129 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.620 | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | substituted for a3748a | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1795 | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 1039A | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/09/2023 | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |