Senate | 03/31/2023 | SUBSTITUTED BY A1060A | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 1043A | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 01/24/2023 | referred to higher education | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.153 | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |