Senate | 04/16/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A5311 | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.395 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2023 | referred to governmental operations | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.226 |