Senate | 05/29/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A2885A | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1467 | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1628 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 1078A | ||
Senate | 06/03/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |