Senate | 06/07/2024 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.360 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | referred to consumer affairs and protection | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.659 |