Senate | 09/15/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.425 | ||
Senate | 09/07/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.213 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | substituted for a2216 | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2023 | referred to local governments | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.300 | ||
Senate | 01/10/2023 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |