Assembly | 05/23/2024 | referred to racing and wagering | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1125 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.334 |