Senate | 05/29/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | referred to health | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1159B | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.381 | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 1159A | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.244 |