Senate | 12/13/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.571 | ||
Senate | 12/02/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.401 | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2024 | substituted for a1390 | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2024 | referred to education | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.517 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.403 |