Assembly | 01/03/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2023 | referred to governmental operations | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.394 |