Senate | 01/22/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | ||
Senate | 12/27/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 1197B | ||
Senate | 12/27/2023 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES | ||
Senate | 12/20/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 1197A | ||
Senate | 12/20/2023 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.519 |