Senate | 06/07/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | REPASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1201C | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.1380 | ||
Senate | 05/07/2024 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 1201B | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1201A | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | 1ST REPORT CAL.126 |