Senate | 03/05/2024 | SUBSTITUTED BY A1080B | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.491 | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 1218B | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | PRINT NUMBER 1218A |