Senate | 12/21/2024 | APPROVAL MEMO.72 | ||
Senate | 12/21/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.641 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.299 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | substituted for a901a | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | REPASSED SENATE | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | referred to insurance | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1267A | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | 1ST REPORT CAL.92 | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | died in assembly | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.85 | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |