Senate | 06/30/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.170 | ||
Senate | 06/26/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.222 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | substituted for a4135 | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2023 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.570 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |