Senate | 03/03/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.94 | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.49 | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2023 | substituted for a999 | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2023 | referred to labor | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.94 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |