Senate | 03/03/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.96 | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/24/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.41 | ||
Assembly | 01/24/2023 | substituted for a967 | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2023 | referred to codes | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.102 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |