Senate | 03/24/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.115 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.92 | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2023 | substituted for a993 | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2023 | referred to energy | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.114 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |