Senate | 03/03/2023 | SIGNED CHAP.100 | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.99 | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2023 | substituted for a3770 | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2023 | referred to health | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.116 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES |